This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:01:55 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Thomas, David Vernon

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Thomas, David Vernon. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Reilley, James F, Lucena, Kristen A, Worley, Kurt W and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3610

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Reilley, James F

Lucena, Kristen A

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Thomas, David Vernon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Trenholme, Steven Neil

Ortner, Eric R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: S Trenholme

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Drug Court Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: referred to drug court

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Reilley, James F; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Dupre-Tokos, BCSO 21-04129

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • ChargeThomas, David Vernon; PC242-M- Battery; Statute: 242; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trenholme, Steven Neil

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R