This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:01:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Candela, Michael P and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5996

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case (Arraignment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: trailing mental health case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketWarrant Recalled Before Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Reappointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketWarrant Recalled Before Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Post disposition; Original Type: Other Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case ( Arraignment) ** Recall Warrant Before Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: trailing mental health case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Szychowski; PPD 21-1160

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Defendant: TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • ChargeTAMAYO, SARA TANELLE; PC166(a)(4)-M- Disobeying Lawful Court Order; Statute: 166(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vance, Desiree J