This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/22/2021 at 20:01:55 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5994

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

TAMAYO, SARA TANELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Vance, Desiree J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case (Arraignment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trailing Mental Health Case (Arraignment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: trailing mental health case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMental Health Doubt Declared

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Szychowski; PPD 21-1203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • ChargeTAMAYO, SARA TANELLE; PC166(a)(4)-M- Disobeying Lawful Court Order; Statute: 166(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vance, Desiree J