This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/05/2022 at 04:10:55 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Swaby, Naud Gosford

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Swaby, Naud Gosford. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Lucena, Kristen A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5991

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Swaby, Naud Gosford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Ortner, Eric R

Gevorkian, Garen

Titus, Marion H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Defendant may appear PC977, CourtCall has been approved for Defense Cousel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCourt Reporter's Transcript; Comment: Prelimianry Hearing (A. Kokezas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; 001; PC114-F- Use Of False Documents; Dismissal - Motion of People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketReceipt; Comment: Release of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: 45 minute time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Espinoza Bail Bonds 2021-CC-017348 $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Bennett; BCSO 21-06684

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Swaby, Naud Gosford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Swaby, Naud Gosford; 002; Description: PC530.5(c)(1)-M- Possession Of Identifying Information With Intent To Defraud; Statute: 530.5(c)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Swaby, Naud Gosford; 001; Description: PC114-F- Use Of False Documents; Statute: 114; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marion H Titus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R