This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 22:03:05 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sumpter, Terry Scott

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sumpter, Terry Scott. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Lucena, Kristen A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0358

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sumpter, Terry Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 003; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 002; HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty; 003; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Roose; PPD 22-0066

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Sumpter, Terry Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sumpter, Terry Scott; 003; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sumpter, Terry Scott; 002; Description: HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11350(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sumpter, Terry Scott; 001; Description: HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.