This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 22:02:23 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sumpter, Terry Scott

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sumpter, Terry Scott. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0353

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sumpter, Terry Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; BP7028.16-M- Contractor License Required To Repair Damage From Natural Disaster; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/17/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 04/01/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 15 Days; Comment: Programs authorized

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; BP7028.16-M- Contractor License Required To Repair Damage From Natural Disaster; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; BP7028.16-M- Contractor License Required To Repair Damage From Natural Disaster; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Lee; BCDA 22INV0065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Sumpter, Terry Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sumpter, Terry Scott; 001; Description: BP7028.16-M- Contractor License Required To Repair Damage From Natural Disaster; Statute: 7028.16; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.