This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/24/2022 at 22:22:57 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0028

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ortner, Eric R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketSheriff's Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - State Prison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 010; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Terminal Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Concurrent: State Prison Term; Term Type: Jail; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 009; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Term Type: 1/3 Middle Term; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 008; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Term Type: 1/3 Middle Term; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 007; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Term Type: 1/3 Middle Term; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 006; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Term Type: 1/3 Middle Term; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 005; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Term Type: 1/3 Middle Term; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionState Prison; 004; PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; State Prison; Adult Confinement; Type: State Prison; Start Date: 02/03/2022; Term Type: 1/3 Middle Term; Term: 1 Year

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 010; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 009; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 008; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 007; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 006; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 005; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 004; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 003; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 002; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • ChargeCharges: STUDDARD, ROBERT ALLEN; 001; Description: PC211-F- Second Degree Robbery; Statute: 211; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R