This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 23:00:32 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Heithecker, Philip H, Candela, Michael P, Caraway, Corie J and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1585

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

Candela, Michael P

Caraway, Corie J

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: Time Estimat: 4 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Assignment Conference; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate: 4 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Motion to Vacate Forfeiture and Exonerate Bail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Time Estimate: 4 days; Address Bail Forfeiture; TAC 8/5, JT 8/8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketMotion; Comment: Motion to Vacate Forfeiture and Exonerate Bail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC459-F- Second Degree Burglary; Not Guilty; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketWarrant Recalled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSecond-Strike Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney J Bennett; CPD 22-01266

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II; 001; Description: PC459-F- Second Degree Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: SPRAGUE, ROBERT EUGENE, II; 001; Description: PC459-F- Second Degree Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony 2nd Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana