This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 20:01:59 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. SPENCER, MATHEW JAMES

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SPENCER, MATHEW JAMES. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4545

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

SPENCER, MATHEW JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Notice to appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProposed Criminal Protective Order - PC136.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Miller; CPD 21-03167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • ChargeSPENCER, MATHEW JAMES; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • ChargeSPENCER, MATHEW JAMES; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant