This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 10:52:56 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Spencer, Justin Rex

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Spencer, Justin Rex. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0077

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Spencer, Justin Rex

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul CPD 23-00095

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Spencer, Justin Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Spencer, Justin Rex; 001; Description: PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less