This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 22:01:45 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Spellman, Carest, Jr.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Spellman, Carest, Jr. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4500

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Spellman, Carest, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Erpino, Michael Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Worley, Kurt W; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Not Guilty; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Not Guilty; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Deny; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Deny

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Worley, Kurt W; 003; VC40508(a)-M- Failure To Appear On Written Promise/Granted Continuance; Set Aside/Withdrawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: recall warrant ordered 40508(a)CVC ordered on 9/3/21; counsel appeared at O/R.Bond and was given 9/24/21 appearance date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • ChargeSpellman, Carest, Jr.; VC40508(a)-M- Failure To Appear On Written Promise/Granted Continuance; Statute: 40508(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed By Deputy District Attorney L Butzow CPD 21-03087

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeSpellman, Carest, Jr.; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeSpellman, Carest, Jr.; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeSpellman, Carest, Jr.; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeSpellman, Carest, Jr.; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erpino, Michael Thomas