This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/30/2022 at 22:08:28 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Soto, Ricardo Antonio

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Soto, Ricardo Antonio. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Giordano, Raymond J, Candela, Michael P and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3465

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Giordano, Raymond J

Candela, Michael P

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Soto, Ricardo Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Proof of Enrollment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: N. Diamond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProbation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights; Comment: Refused to sign

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Greeson CPD 22-04352

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: PC136.2 Order; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Soto, Ricardo Antonio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Soto, Ricardo Antonio; 002; Description: PC69(a)-F- Forcible Obstruction Of Executive Officer; Statute: 69(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Soto, Ricardo Antonio; 001; Description: PC422(a)-F- Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.