This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 21:03:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Smitholson, Crystal Raquel

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Smitholson, Crystal Raquel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Lucena, Kristen A, Hayes, Larry, Benson, Stephen E and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0318

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Lucena, Kristen A

Hayes, Larry

Benson, Stephen E

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Smitholson, Crystal Raquel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DispositionFormal Probation; 001; PC273.6(d)-M- Disobeying Protective Order With Prior; Formal Probation; 002; PC368(c)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Formal Probation; 003; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Formal Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Hayes, Larry; 001; PC273.6(d)-M- Disobeying Protective Order With Prior; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; PC368(c)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 003; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Hayes, Larry; 001; PC273.6(d)-M- Disobeying Protective Order With Prior; No Contest; 002; PC368(c)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Of Elder/Dependent Adult; No Contest; 003; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; No Contest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: B Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Bennett; CPD 23-00416

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Smitholson, Crystal Raquel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Smitholson, Crystal Raquel; 003; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Smitholson, Crystal Raquel; 002; Description: PC368(c)-M- Causes/Permits Abuse Of Elder/Dependent Adult; Statute: 368(c); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Smitholson, Crystal Raquel; 001; Description: PC273.6(d)-M- Disobeying Protective Order With Prior; Statute: 273.6(d); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less