This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 21:02:52 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Smith, Rocky Merrill, Jr.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Smith, Rocky Merrill, Jr. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Worley, Kurt W and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5115

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Smith, Rocky Merrill, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketRequest and Order for Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed; Comment: OPD 21-4541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to Oroville Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRelease on Own Recognizance Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Szychowski OPD 21-3853

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Smith, Rocky Merrill, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeSmith, Rocky Merrill, Jr.; PC602(o)-M- Trespass And Refuse To Leave Private Property; Statute: 602(o); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Latimer, Denver Michael