This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/16/2022 at 20:03:17 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sims, Tristan Jacob

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sims, Tristan Jacob. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2447

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sims, Tristan Jacob

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards; CHPC 202200133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sims, Tristan Jacob; 002; Description: VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sims, Tristan Jacob; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sims, Tristan Jacob; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sims, Tristan Jacob; 001; Description: VC23540- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sims, Tristan Jacob; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sims, Tristan Jacob; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant