This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 19:01:40 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Simpson, Tracy Marilyn

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Simpson, Tracy Marilyn. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0151

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Simpson, Tracy Marilyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Teja, CHPO M493-240-22 With Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Simpson, Tracy Marilyn; 002; Description: VC12500(a)-M- Driving Without Valid License; Statute: 12500(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Simpson, Tracy Marilyn; 001; Description: PC243(c)(2)-M- Battery On A Peace Officer; Statute: 243(c)(2); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less