This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 22:24:10 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Silvera, Edward William

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Silvera, Edward William. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3154

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Silvera, Edward William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketJudge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketArraignment Violation - Post Release Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 10:32 AM; Comment: Petition filed 6/30/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPetition - Revoke Post Release Community Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Silvera, Edward William; 001; Description: PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant