This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/06/2021 at 21:02:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Shuler, Lorene Star

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Shuler, Lorene Star. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3495

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Shuler, Lorene Star

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Time estimate: 45 minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 006; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 002; PC496(a)-M- Receiving Stolen Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Noel, BCSO 21-03991

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Amend Count 2 offense date to July 6; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Shuler, Lorene Star

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • ChargeShuler, Lorene Star; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • ChargeShuler, Lorene Star; PC496(a)-M- Receiving Stolen Property; Statute: 496(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew