This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 22:03:59 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sheley, Nicholas John

Case Summary

On 03/10/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sheley, Nicholas John. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Worley, Kurt W and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1222

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sheley, Nicholas John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Caraway, Christopher W.

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Petition Filed 06/07/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPetition - Violation of Probation; Comment: Petition for Hearing Re: Violation of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Proof of Enrollment; Serve Amended 136.2 PC order- no protected party listed on post judgement order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 002; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Court Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 04/21/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 30 Days; Comment: programs authorized; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 04/28/2022; Programs; Batterers Treatment Program; Ordered; Order Date: 04/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC236-M- False Imprisonment; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 002; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 4/8/22; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Sheley, Nicholas John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Roose CPD 21-07801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sheley, Nicholas John; 002; Description: PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Sheley, Nicholas John; 001; Description: PC236-M- False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J