This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 22:01:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sheard, Shane Steven

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sheard, Shane Steven. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Lucena, Kristen A, Clark, Linda, To Be Assigned, TBA and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1722

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Lucena, Kristen A

Clark, Linda

To Be Assigned, TBA

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sheard, Shane Steven

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Petelin, James J

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSetting of Evidentiary Hearing - Postdispo; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Petition filed 05/10/22, Probation Revoked 05/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketReferral from Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketWork Program Placement; Comment: 10 hours Hope Center

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSetting of Evidentiary Hearing - Postdispo; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Petition filed 05/10/22, Probation Revoked 05/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDenial of Violation of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Mannion; BCSO 22-02148

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sheard, Shane Steven; 002; Description: PC245(a)(4)-M- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sheard, Shane Steven; 001; Description: PC422(a)-M- Criminal Threats; Statute: 422(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore