This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 21:03:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Serrano, Reynaldo, Jr.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Serrano, Reynaldo, Jr. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Lucena, Kristen A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4819

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Serrano, Reynaldo, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Ortner, Eric R

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketApplication / Request for Mental Health Diversion PC1001.36; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketApplication / Request for Mental Health Diversion PC1001.36; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCommunication from Mental Health Physician; Comment: From Department of Behavioral Health

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Set per DA's request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Lucena, Kristen A; 001; VC14601.2(b)-M- Driving In Violation of DUI-Related License Restriction; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 10/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney S Roose; OPD 21-3475

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • ChargeSerrano, Reynaldo, Jr.; VC14601.2(b)-M- Driving In Violation of DUI-Related License Restriction; Statute: 14601.2(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R