This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 20:02:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sells, Madison Lynne

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sells, Madison Lynne. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Candela, Michael P and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5119

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sells, Madison Lynne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Need not guilty plea; TAY suitability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Need Statement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney E. Romo CPD 21-05941

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Sells, Madison Lynne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • ChargeSells, Madison Lynne; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore