This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 22:02:46 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Seaton, Devin Patrick

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Seaton, Devin Patrick. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5170

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Seaton, Devin Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Lucena, Kristen A; 001; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Greeson; BCSO 21-05829

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Seaton, Devin Patrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • ChargeSeaton, Devin Patrick; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • ChargeSeaton, Devin Patrick; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore