This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 21:02:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Searles, Brian Matthew

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Searles, Brian Matthew. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Heithecker, Philip H, Worley, Kurt W, Rodriguez, Jesus A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2863

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Searles, Brian Matthew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ortner, Eric R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC417(a)(1)-M- Exhibiting Deadly Weapon; Not Guilty; 002; PC647(h)-M- Loitering/Prowling Upon Private Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Miller CPD 22-03294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Please vacate 8/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Searles, Brian Matthew; 002; Description: PC647(h)-M- Loitering/Prowling Upon Private Property; Statute: 647(h); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Searles, Brian Matthew; 001; Description: PC417(a)(1)-M- Exhibiting Deadly Weapon; Statute: 417(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R