This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 21:02:23 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Searles, Brian Matthew

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Searles, Brian Matthew. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Candela, Michael P and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2862

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Candela, Michael P

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Searles, Brian Matthew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ortner, Eric R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketProbation Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Comment: Petition Filed 8/9/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketPetition - Violation of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: unsigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketProbation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Miller CPD 22-03633

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Searles, Brian Matthew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Searles, Brian Matthew; 002; Description: PC484(a)-488-490.2(a)-M- Petty Theft Not Exceeding $950; Statute: 484(a)-488-490.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Searles, Brian Matthew; 001; Description: PC594(a)-F- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R