This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 00:38:43 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5723

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 03/14/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 03/14/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 4 Days; Comment: 96 Hours; programs authorized. Remanded today at the request of the defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Found True; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 003; VC40508(a)-M- Failure To Appear On Written Promise/Granted Continuance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: unsigned- no show

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketWarrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Warrant Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Butzow CPD 21-05117

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SCHRODER, GERALD RICHARD; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant