This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 21:01:02 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Samson, Jeremiah Joe

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Samson, Jeremiah Joe. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Lucena, Kristen A and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5986

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Lucena, Kristen A

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Samson, Jeremiah Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Not Guilty; 002; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Diversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility for Prop 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Mannion; PPD 21-1202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Samson, Jeremiah Joe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeSamson, Jeremiah Joe; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • ChargeSamson, Jeremiah Joe; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore