This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 00:38:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Worley, Kurt W and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5720

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Worley, Kurt W

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Chopra, Anu

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Completion - DUI School; Comment: Safety Center Incorporated-3M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCompliance Review; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Completion of SCRAM/Judicial Options

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School; Comment: Proof of Enrollment in DUI Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketProof of Completion for Monitoring Program; Comment: SCRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 001; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver; 002; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: M. Fahey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Butzow; CHPC 202100443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • ChargeCharges: SAECHAO, RAYMOND THORN; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chopra, Anu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W