This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/29/2022 at 20:04:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Sackett, Georgia Delores

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sackett, Georgia Delores. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3166

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Sackett, Georgia Delores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards; CHPC 9241-2022-00250

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sackett, Georgia Delores; 003; Description: VC23103-23103.5-M- Reckless Driving - Alcohol Related; Statute: 23103-23103.5; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sackett, Georgia Delores; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Sackett, Georgia Delores; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant