This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 21:01:35 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ryn, David Gordan

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ryn, David Gordan. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Merrifield, Kimberly, Heithecker, Philip H and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3600

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ryn, David Gordan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Supplemental

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Mannion; CPD 22-4562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Ryn, David Gordan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ryn, David Gordan; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J