This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 21:01:12 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ryn, David Gordan

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ryn, David Gordan. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Candela, Michael P, Merrifield, Kimberly and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3596

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ryn, David Gordan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 9/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Mannion CPD 22-04233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Vacate 09/02/2022; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Ryn, David Gordan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ryn, David Gordan; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J