This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/31/2022 at 22:08:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Russell, Tanner James

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Russell, Tanner James. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2992

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Russell, Tanner James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Time Estimate 30 Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon, Vehicle; Not Guilty; 002; PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon, Vehicle; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Comment: DV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProposed Criminal Protective Order - PC136.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketStatement of Eligibility - Transitional Age Youth Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Miller; CPD 22-01659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Russell, Tanner James; 002; Description: PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon, Vehicle; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Russell, Tanner James; 001; Description: PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon, Vehicle; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.