This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 20:02:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. ROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Merrifield, Kimberly and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5118

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

ROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: proof of enrollment, logs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketReferral to DUI Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProbation Order; Comment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Butzow CHP-O M397-240-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • ChargeROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • ChargeROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • ChargeROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN; VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • ChargeROWE, JOSHUA HARLAN; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W