This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 20:01:42 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ross, Zachary Lee

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ross, Zachary Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4877

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ross, Zachary Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; Not Guilty; 002; VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Not Guilty; 003; PC496(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Property; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Need Signed O/R Conditions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: Needs Signed O/R Conditions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Roose PK 210919N-0175

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Ross, Zachary Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeRoss, Zachary Lee; PC496(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Property; Statute: 496(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeRoss, Zachary Lee; VC10851(a)-F- Vehicle Theft; Statute: 10851(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • ChargeRoss, Zachary Lee; PC459-F- First Degree Burglary; Statute: 459; Level: Felony 1st Degree

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore