This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/03/2022 at 22:02:40 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Romero, Cody David

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Romero, Cody David. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Chandler, Christopher R and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5111

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Chandler, Christopher R

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Romero, Cody David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Assignment Conference; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Chandler, Christopher R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: need time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOther Hearing - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: status/ time estimate for trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketTime Not Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Complaint Deemed Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Complaint Deemed Informaiton, Vacate 12/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 1st Amended Complaint Filed 10/12/2021; Need Statement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Need Statement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Comment: 1st Amended Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Miller OPD 21-2660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Count1 Should be PC496d(a); If Defenadant Fails to Appear, Request a DA Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Mannion OPD 21-2660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • ChargeRomero, Cody David; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • ChargeRomero, Cody David; PC496d(a)-F- Receiving Stolen Vehicle/Vessel/Equipment; Statute: 496d(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore