This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 17:00:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Rodriquez, Travis Michael

Case Summary

On 03/24/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rodriquez, Travis Michael. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1239

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rodriquez, Travis Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketChange of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Rodriquez, Travis Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards CPD 22-02977

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketNotice - Sentence - Commitment Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketNotice - Sentence - Commitment Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriquez, Travis Michael; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriquez, Travis Michael; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriquez, Travis Michael; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriquez, Travis Michael; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less