This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 22:01:38 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Rodriguez, Roger Gene

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rodriguez, Roger Gene. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Candela, Michael P, Lucena, Kristen A and Chandler, Christopher R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0349

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Candela, Michael P

Lucena, Kristen A

Chandler, Christopher R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rodriguez, Roger Gene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Petelin, James J

Williams, Brandon Theodore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketTransfer Hearing; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: to Riverside County Pursuant to PC1203.9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Status of transfer out and completion of work programs hours

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPetition for Transfer Out PC1203.9; Comment: to Riverside County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Proof of enrollment;Please address work program hours

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re Failure to Complete Work Program; Comment: **Informational** Failed work program-40 hour due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Proof of enrollment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment; Comment: Domestic Violence program/Progress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Bennett; PPD 22-0063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Rodriguez, Roger Gene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriguez, Roger Gene; 003; Description: PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriguez, Roger Gene; 002; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rodriguez, Roger Gene; 001; Description: PC273.5(a)-F- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Brandon Theodore