This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 14:55:20 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs ROBERTS, ERIC SCOTT DUERR

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBERTS, ERIC SCOTT DUERR. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0242

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

ROBERTS, ERIC SCOTT DUERR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Latimer, Denver Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • DispositionParole/Post Release Community Supervision; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Parole/Post Release Community Supervision; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 01/27/2023; Concurrent: 23CM00223; Term Type: Jail; Term: 180 Days; Comment: Without Time Loss. Defendant ordered to report to Parole 72 Hours following release.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Admitted Violation (PCS/Parole/Mandatory Supervision)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Admit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketParole Reinstated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketParole Revoked

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Further; Petition Filed 1/19/23; Parole Revoked 1/19/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAdmit/Deny Violation of Parole; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition filed 1/19/23; Parole Revoked 1/19/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketParole Revoked

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPetition - Revoke State Parole

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition filed 1/19/23; Defendant: ROBERTS, ERIC SCOTT DUERR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • ChargeCharges: ROBERTS, ERIC SCOTT DUERR; 001; Description: PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Statute: 3000.08; Level: Unknown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less