This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 22:01:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Rivera, Richie Joe

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rivera, Richie Joe. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Lucena, Kristen A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1872

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rivera, Richie Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M.

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketLetter(s) Submitted to Court; Comment: Letter from Diane Rivera dated May 23, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney M Emmons; BCSO 22-02412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Rivera, Richie Joe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Rivera, Richie Joe; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.