This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 20:01:53 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Rentko, Zachary Stafford

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rentko, Zachary Stafford. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5113

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Rentko, Zachary Stafford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketArraignment on Information; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Complaint Deemed Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC4573.6(a)-F- Possession Of Controlled Substance Or Paraphernalia In Prison/Jail; Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint Deemed Information pursuant to Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketWaiver of Preliminary Hearing and Held to Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFingerprint Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 30 Minute Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC4573.6(a)-F- Possession Of Controlled Substance Or Paraphernalia In Prison/Jail; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketTime Not Waived; Comment: PX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo BCSO 21-05652

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Rentko, Zachary Stafford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeRentko, Zachary Stafford; PC4573.6(a)-F- Possession Of Controlled Substance Or Paraphernalia In Prison/Jail; Statute: 4573.6(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • ChargeRentko, Zachary Stafford; PC4573.6(a)-F- Possession Of Controlled Substance Or Paraphernalia In Prison/Jail; Statute: 4573.6(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew