This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 21:02:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Reed, Leighton Patrick

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Reed, Leighton Patrick. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R, Candela, Michael P, Heithecker, Philip H and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2244

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Heithecker, Philip H

Candela, Michael P

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Reed, Leighton Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Raven, Jeffrey Brian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 002; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal - Motion of People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; PC21310-F- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR; Comment: If released

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney V Carrillo; CPD 22-02709

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Reed, Leighton Patrick; 002; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Reed, Leighton Patrick; 001; Description: PC21310-F- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Statute: 21310; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raven, Jeffrey Brian