This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 22:05:15 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Deems, Michael R and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0222

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Deems, Michael R

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Raven, Jeffrey Brian

Femino, Stephana

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed; Comment: J. Raven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: S. Femino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketInterpreter Required During Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A Insul CHP-C 2021-00550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus; 002; Description: VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Statute: 23546; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus; 001; Description: VC23546 - Prior Conviction of a DUI; Statute: 23546; Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirezhernandez, Hector Jesus; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raven, Jeffrey Brian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana