Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/08/2021 at 20:03:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ramirez, Uriah James

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ramirez, Uriah James. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2999

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Butte County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ramirez, Uriah James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Sears, Kevin Andrew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Hunter, OPD 21-2149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • ChargeRamirez, Uriah James; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sears, Kevin Andrew