This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 22:01:30 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ramirez, John Anthony, Sr.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ramirez, John Anthony, Sr. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Candela, Michael P. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0216

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Candela, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ramirez, John Anthony, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Termination of Protective Order; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Please verify spelling of victim's name on 136.2 PC order. CPD states last name should be Sherrill, 136.2 PC order 1/20/22 does not list address on # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketProgress Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Please verify spelling of victim's name on 136.2 PC order. CPD states last name should be Sherrill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney T Vercruyssen CPD 22-000234

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Ramirez, John Anthony, Sr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ramirez, John Anthony, Sr.; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J