This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/27/2023 at 19:02:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ramakar, Arjuna

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ramakar, Arjuna. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0158

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ramakar, Arjuna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney A. Insul, CHPO M373-240-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketMemorandum; Comment: With Copy of Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ramakar, Arjuna; 003; Description: VC16028(a)-I- Failure To Provide Financial Responsibility Evidence To Officer; Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ramakar, Arjuna; 002; Description: VC4000(a)(1)-I- No Evidence Of Current Registration; Statute: 4000(a)(1); Level: Infraction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ramakar, Arjuna; 001; Description: VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less