This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 15:00:07 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Pulley, Harold George

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Pulley, Harold George. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Benson, Stephen E and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0412

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Benson, Stephen E

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Pulley, Harold George

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Pulley, Harold George

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Jones, CHPO M192-240-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Pulley, Harold George; 002; Description: VC16028(a)-I- Failure To Provide Financial Responsibility Evidence To Officer; Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Pulley, Harold George; 001; Description: VC14601.2(a)-M- Driving While Suspended/Revoked For DUI Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 14601.2(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less