This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 21:29:45 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Price, Adam Joseph

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Price, Adam Joseph. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Caraway, Corie J and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0258

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Caraway, Corie J

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Price, Adam Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Terminal Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 01/26/2023; Term Type: Jail; Term: 180 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; 001; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; 001; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; No Contest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: Ben Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney D. Lee; BCSO 23-00258

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Price, Adam Joseph

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Price, Adam Joseph; 002; Description: HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • ChargeCharges: Price, Adam Joseph; 001; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less