This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 21:02:36 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. PONTHIER, DIEGO MOISES

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PONTHIER, DIEGO MOISES. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2136

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

PONTHIER, DIEGO MOISES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M

Diamond, Nicole M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Ruling; Submitted on Police Reports

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMotion; Comment: People's Motion to seal police reports Submitted for Purpose of Preliminary Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 45 minute time estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; VC2800.2(a)-F- Evading An Officer With Willful Disregard; Not Guilty; 002; VC23109(c)-M- Engaging/Aiding/Abetting In Motor Vehicle Speed Contest On Highway; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCash Bail Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney V. Carrillo; UP 22-0082

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Defendant: PONTHIER, DIEGO MOISES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PONTHIER, DIEGO MOISES; 002; Description: VC23109(c)-M- Engaging/Aiding/Abetting In Motor Vehicle Speed Contest On Highway; Statute: 23109(c); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: PONTHIER, DIEGO MOISES; 001; Description: VC2800.2(a)-F- Evading An Officer With Willful Disregard; Statute: 2800.2(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.