This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 16:02:08 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Ponci, Jennifer Lee

Case Summary

On 03/24/2023 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Ponci, Jennifer Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1240

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Ponci, Jennifer Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Hearne, Susan Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Need Statement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketPC 977 - Waiver of Personal Appearance by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Hearne, Susan Marie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Prosecution Pursuant to VC23622(c)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards CPD 22-06912

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice - Sentence - Commitment Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMemorandum

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice - Sentence - Commitment Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 003; Description: VC23154(a)-I- Driving With Blood Alcohol Level Of .01 Or Greater While On Probation; Statute: 23154(a); Level: Infraction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 002; Description: VC23540(a)- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540(a); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 002; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 001; Description: VC23540(a)- With Prior For Driving Under Influence: Additional Term; Statute: 23540(a); Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 001; Description: VC23578 - With Excessive Alcohol; Statute: 23578; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Ponci, Jennifer Lee; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less