This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 22:13:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Piper, Justin Dean

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Piper, Justin Dean. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Deems, Michael R and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3399

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Deems, Michael R

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Piper, Justin Dean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Confidential Attachment (Fines / Fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Submitted Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 002; HS11351-F- Possession For Sale Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Motion of People; 003; HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Motion of People

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; 001; HS11375(b)(1)-F- Possession For Sale Of Designated Controlled Substance; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Noel; BNTF 22-4484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Piper, Justin Dean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Piper, Justin Dean; 003; Description: HS11378-F- Possession For Sale/Controlled Substance; Statute: 11378; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Piper, Justin Dean; 002; Description: HS11351-F- Possession For Sale Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11351; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Piper, Justin Dean; 001; Description: HS11375(b)(1)-F- Possession For Sale Of Designated Controlled Substance; Statute: 11375(b)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.